Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Umberto D’Ambrosio

Archbishop Emeritus of Lecce, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1941 Born
19 Jul 196523.8Ordained PriestPriest of Manfredonia-Vieste, Italy
14 Dec 198948.2AppointedBishop of Termoli-Larino, Italy
6 Jan 199048.3Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli-Larino, Italy
27 May 199957.6AppointedArchbishop of Foggia-Bovino, Italy
8 Mar 200361.4AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia-Vieste-San Giovanni Rotondo, Italy
16 Apr 200967.5AppointedArchbishop of Lecce, Italy
29 Sep 201776.0RetiredArchbishop of Lecce, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Umberto D’Ambrosio (VIAF: 304921522)
Archbishop Domenico Umberto D’Ambrosio (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lecce

EventPlace
Birth PlacePeschici
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lecce.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,685
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 29 Sep 2017