Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Beniamino Cardinal Stella

Prefect of the Congregation for the Clergy

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1941 BornPieve di Soligo, Italy
19 Mar 196624.6Ordained PriestPriest of Vittorio Veneto, Italy
21 Aug 198746.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Midila
21 Aug 198746.0AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
5 Sep 198746.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Midila
7 Nov 198746.2AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Congo, Republic of
15 Dec 199251.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cuba
11 Feb 199957.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Colombia
13 Oct 200766.2AppointedPresident of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy, Roman Curia
21 Sep 201372.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Clergy
22 Feb 201472.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
22 Feb 201472.5Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 201472.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano

MicroData Summary for Beniamino Stella:
Beniamino Cardinal Stella (born ) Prefect of Clergy

Please contact the Cardinal through the Congregation for the Clergy.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,154
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2013
  • c: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2014
  • cd: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2014
  • i: Bollettino, 19 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 May 2014