Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ramon Cabrera Argüelles

Archbishop Emeritus of Lipa, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1944 Born
21 Dec 196925.1Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 199349.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
26 Nov 199349.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ros Cré
6 Jan 199449.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ros Cré
25 Aug 199550.7AppointedBishop of Philippines, Military
14 May 200459.5AppointedArchbishop of Lipa, Philippines
16 Jul 200459.6InstalledArchbishop of Lipa, Philippines
2 Feb 201772.2ResignedArchbishop of Lipa, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Ramon Cabrera Argüelles
Archbishop Ramon Cabrera Argüelles (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lipa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBatangas City

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lipa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,194
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Feb 2017