Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop St. Józef Bilczewski

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1860BornWilamowice, Austria
6 Jul 188424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków, Poland
30 Oct 190040.5SelectedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
17 Dec 190040.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
20 Jan 190140.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
20 Mar 192362.9DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
26 Jun 2001Beatified
23 Oct 2005Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Józef Bilczewski:
Archbishop St. Józef Bilczewski (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • cano: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,806
  • beat: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,866
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 339
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013