Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Henry Benedict Mary Clement Cardinal Stuart of York

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso

Archpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1725BornRoma, Italy
3 Jul 174722.3Elevated to Cardinal
31 Jul 174722.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
25 Aug 174823.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Sep 174823.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Sep 174823.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
8 Nov 175126.6AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
18 Dec 175227.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
2 Oct 175833.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
19 Nov 175833.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
12 Feb 175933.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
13 Jul 176136.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
24 Jan 176337.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
26 Sep 180378.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
13 Jul 180782.3DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

MicroData Summary for Henry Benedict Mary Clement Stuart of York (VIAF: 76544198)
Henry Benedict Mary Clement Cardinal Stuart of York (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 48.6 years
  • a cardinal for 60.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Jul 1747
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1758, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016