Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Coşa

Bishop of Chişinău, Moldova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1961 Born
25 Jun 198927.5Ordained PriestPriest of Iaşi, Romania
28 Oct 199331.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Moldova
30 Oct 199937.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Pesto
6 Jan 200038.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pesto
27 Oct 200139.9AppointedBishop of Chişinău, Moldova

MicroData Summary for Anton Coşa (VIAF: 193130894)
Bishop Anton Coşa (born ) Bishop of Chişinău

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValea Mare, Romania
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chişinău.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,666

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 13 Nov 2018

Quantcast