Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René-Marie Ehouzou, C.I.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Porto Novo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1944BornCotonou
30 Sep 197228.5Ordained PriestPriest
1984²39.7ProfessedPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
19 Nov 200258.6AppointedBishop of Abomey, Benin
6 Jan 200358.7Ordained BishopBishop of Abomey, Benin
3 Jan 200762.7AppointedBishop of Porto Novo, Benin
4 Feb 200762.8InstalledBishop of Porto Novo, Benin
17 Oct 201268.5DiedBishop of Porto Novo, Benin

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for René-Marie Ehouzou:
Bishop René-Marie Ehouzou C.I.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Porto Novo

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,306
  • d: CB, 18 Oct 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013