Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Crescenzio Cardinal Sepe

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

Cardinal-Priest of Dio Padre misericordioso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1943 BornCarinaro, Italy
12 Mar 196723.8Ordained PriestPriest of Aversa, Italy
2 Apr 199248.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gradum
2 Apr 199248.8AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Clergy
26 Apr 199248.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Gradum
21 Feb 200157.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Dio Padre misericordioso
21 Feb 200157.7Elevated to Cardinal
9 Apr 200157.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
16 Nov 200360.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Dio Padre misericordioso
2 Apr 200561.8CeasedPrefect of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
21 Apr 200561.9ConfirmedPrefect of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
20 May 200663.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Dio Padre misericordioso
20 May 200663.0AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
1 Jul 200663.1InstalledArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Crescenzio Sepe:
Crescenzio Cardinal Sepe (born ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 May 2006
  • cpri: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2007
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Feb 2001
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 91*
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,669

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 31 Oct 2014