Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward James Slattery

Bishop Emeritus of Tulsa, Oklahoma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1940 BornChicago
26 Apr 196625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
11 Nov 199353.2AppointedBishop of Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA
6 Jan 199453.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA
13 May 201675.7RetiredBishop of Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward James Slattery
Bishop Edward James Slattery (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Tulsa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tulsa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,189
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • r: Bollettino, 13 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 Jun 2016