Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Libera

Bishop of Płock


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1951 BornSzopienice
15 Apr 197625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Katowice, Poland
23 Nov 199645.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Katowice, Poland
23 Nov 199645.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Centuria
6 Jan 199745.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Centuria
2 May 200756.1AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
31 May 200756.1InstalledBishop of Płock, Poland

MicroData Summary for Piotr Libera:
Bishop Piotr Libera (born ) Bishop of Płock

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Płock.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 May 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,882

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015