Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Richard Anthony Burke, S.P.S.

Archbishop Emeritus of Benin City, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1949 Born
1 Oct 197122.6ProfessedMember of St. Patrick’s Society for the Foreign Missions
7 Jun 197324.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of St. Patrick’s Society for the Foreign Missions
18 May 197526.2Ordained PriestPriest of St. Patrick’s Society for the Foreign Missions
6 Dec 199546.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Warri, Nigeria
6 Jan 199646.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Warri, Nigeria
3 Mar 199748.0SucceededBishop of Warri, Nigeria
24 Dec 200758.8AppointedArchbishop of Benin City, Nigeria
24 Dec 200758.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Warri, Nigeria
7 Mar 200859.0InstalledArchbishop of Benin City, Nigeria
29 Mar 201061.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Warri, Nigeria
31 May 201061.2ResignedArchbishop of Benin City, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Richard Anthony Burke
Archbishop Richard Anthony Burke S.P.S. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Benin City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClonmel, Ireland

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Benin City.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Dec 2007
  • r: Bollettino, 31 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,648

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 22 Sep 2017