Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro G. Magugat, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Urdaneta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1925BornSanta Maria
8 Dec 195227.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
23 Apr 197954.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cabanatuan, Philippines
23 Apr 197954.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Scilium
27 May 197954.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scilium
9 Dec 198156.6AppointedBishop of Philippines, Military
22 Apr 198560.0AppointedBishop of Urdaneta, Philippines
5 May 199065.0DiedBishop of Urdaneta, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Pedro G. Magugat:
Bishop Pedro G. Magugat M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Urdaneta

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015