Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Naanman Daman, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Shendam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1956BornKwa
14 Feb 198225.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
5 Dec 200044.6AppointedBishop of Jalingo, Nigeria
24 Feb 200144.8Ordained BishopBishop of Jalingo, Nigeria
2 Jun 200751.1AppointedBishop of Shendam, Nigeria
12 Jan 201558.7DiedBishop of Shendam, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for James Naanman Daman:
Bishop James Naanman Daman O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Shendam

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,917
  • d: CB, 13 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 14 Jan 2015