Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edward Nowak

Secretary Emeritus of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints

Titular Archbishop of Luni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1940 Born
6 Jan 196322.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Przemyśl, Poland
13 Jan 196322.8Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Poland
24 Feb 199050.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Luni
24 Feb 199050.0AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
5 Apr 199050.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Luni
5 May 200767.2ResignedSecretary of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints

MicroData Summary for Edward Nowak
Archbishop Edward Nowak (born ) Secretary Emeritus of Causes of Saints

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZmigród Nowy, Poland

Please contact the Archbishop through the Congregation for the Causes of Saints.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 May 2007
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,783
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 14 Sep 2017