Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jozef Cardinal Tomko

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Committee for International Eucharistic Congresses

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1924Born
12 Mar 194925.0Ordained PriestPriest of Košice, Slovakia
12 Jul 197955.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Doclea
12 Jul 197955.3AppointedSecretary General of the Synod of Bishops
15 Sep 197955.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Doclea
24 Apr 198561.1AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
25 May 198561.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Gesů Buon Pastore alla Montagnola
25 May 198561.2Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 198561.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
29 Jan 199671.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
9 Apr 200177.0RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
23 Oct 200177.6AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Committee for International Eucharistic Congresses
1 Oct 200783.5RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Committee for International Eucharistic Congresses
8 Aug 202298.4DiedPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Committee for International Eucharistic Congresses

MicroData Summary for Jozef Tomko
(VIAF: 39392191; WikiData: Q257423)
Jozef Cardinal Tomko (born , died ) President Emeritus of International Eucharistic Congresses

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUdavské, Diocese of Košice, Slovakia
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)St. Elizabeth, Cathedral, Košice, Archdiocese of Košice, Slovakia

  • a priest for 73.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
  • a cardinal for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 4,044
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • opd: AM, 28 May 2022
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 25 May 1985
  • d: CB, 8 Aug 2022
  • opd: AM, 10 Jan 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 27 Jan 2024