Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Habib Hitti

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Maron of Sydney (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1925 BornAytou, Lebanon
24 Mar 195125.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Nov 199065.1AppointedBishop of Saint Maron of Sydney (Maronite), Australia
6 Jan 199165.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Maron of Sydney (Maronite), Australia
4 Mar 199165.4InstalledBishop of Saint Maron of Sydney (Maronite), Australia
26 Oct 200176.0ResignedBishop of Saint Maron of Sydney (Maronite), Australia

MicroData Summary for Joseph Habib Hitti:
Bishop Joseph Habib Hitti (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Maron of Sydney

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saint Maron of Sydney (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,303
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015