Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Norbert Wendelin Mtega

Archbishop Emeritus of Songea, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1945 Born
14 Nov 197328.2Ordained PriestPriest of Njombe, Tanzania
28 Oct 198540.1AppointedBishop of Iringa, Tanzania
6 Jan 198640.3Ordained BishopBishop of Iringa, Tanzania
6 Jul 199246.8AppointedArchbishop of Songea, Tanzania
15 May 201367.7ResignedArchbishop of Songea, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Norbert Wendelin Mtega
Archbishop Norbert Wendelin Mtega (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Songea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKinyika

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Songea.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast