Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Mizonzo

Bishop of Nkayi, Congo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1953 Born
12 Jul 198127.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Oct 200148.0AppointedBishop of Nkayi, Congo
6 Jan 200248.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nkayi, Congo

MicroData Summary for Daniel Mizonzo (VIAF: 208056015)
Bishop Daniel Mizonzo (born ) Bishop of Nkayi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNzaou-Mouyondzi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nkayi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,098

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast