Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Athanasius Atule Usuh

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Makurdi, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1942Born
19 Dec 197129.6Ordained PriestPriest of Makurdi, Nigeria
18 Nov 198745.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Makurdi, Nigeria
6 Jan 198845.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Makurdi, Nigeria
2 Jun 198947.0SucceededBishop of Makurdi, Nigeria
28 Mar 201572.9RetiredBishop of Makurdi, Nigeria
14 Jul 201674.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Makurdi, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Athanasius Atule Usuh
Bishop Athanasius Atule Usuh (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Makurdi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMbagen

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,426
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Mar 2015
  • d: CB, 14 Jul 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018