Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Pennacchio

Apostolic Nuncio to India

Titular Archbishop of Montemarano

Apostolic Nuncio to Nepal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1952 BornMarano, Italy
18 Sep 197624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Aversa, Italy
28 Nov 199846.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Montemarano
28 Nov 199846.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Rwanda
6 Jan 199946.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Montemarano
20 Sep 200351.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Thailand
20 Sep 200351.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Singapore
20 Sep 200351.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cambodia
20 Sep 200351.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Myanmar
20 Sep 200351.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Laos
20 Sep 200351.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Malaysia
20 Sep 200351.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Brunei Darussalam
8 May 201057.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to India
13 Nov 201058.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nepal

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Pennacchio:
Archbishop Salvatore Pennacchio (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of India

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to India.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 May 2010
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 6 Oct 2014