Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franco Croci

Deceased

Vice President Emeritus of the Labour Office of the Apostolic See

Titular Bishop of Potentia in Piceno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1930Born
30 Sep 196131.2Ordained PriestPriest of Crema, Italy
3 Dec 199969.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Potentia in Piceno
3 Dec 199969.4AppointedSecretary of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See
6 Jan 200069.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Potentia in Piceno
3 Sep 200777.1RetiredSecretary of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See
13 Oct 200777.3AppointedVice President of the Labour Office of the Apostolic See
1 Jan 201079.5ResignedVice President of the Labour Office of the Apostolic See
28 Jul 202191.0DiedVice President Emeritus of the Labour Office of the Apostolic See

MicroData Summary for Franco Croci
Bishop Franco Croci (born , died ) Vice President Emeritus of Labour Office of the Apostolic See

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained PriestCrema, Diocese of Crema, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cimitero monumentale, Busto Arsizio, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Sep 2007
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,670
  • d: CB, 29 Jul 2021
  • opd/loc: AM, 24 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Aug 2021

Quantcast