Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Benedict XIII

Pietro Francesco (Vincenzo Maria) Orsini de Gravina, O.P. †

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})

Archbishop of Benevento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1649BornGravina di Puglia
13 Feb 166819.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
22 Feb 167122.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Preachers
24 Feb 167122.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
22 Feb 167223.0Elevated to Cardinal
16 May 167223.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
4 Jan 167323.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
28 Jan 167525.9AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
3 Feb 167526.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
22 Jan 168030.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cesena, Italy
18 Mar 168637.1AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
3 Jan 170151.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
18 Mar 171566.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
29 May 172475.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
4 Jun 172475.3InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
23 Feb 173081.0DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Pietro Francesco (Vincenzo Maria) Orsini de Gravina:
Pope Pietro Francesco (Vincenzo Maria) Orsini de Gravina O.P. (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 55.0 years
  • a cardinal for 52.2 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Feb 1672
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1675, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 26 Apr 2015