Catholic-Hierarchy DC

John Olorunfemi Cardinal Onaiyekan

Archbishop of Abuja

Cardinal-Priest of San Saturnino

Apostolic Administrator of Ahiara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1944 BornKabba
3 Aug 196925.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lokoja, Nigeria
10 Sep 198238.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ilorin, Nigeria
10 Sep 198238.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thunusuda
6 Jan 198338.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thunusuda
20 Oct 198440.7AppointedBishop of Ilorin, Nigeria
7 Jul 199046.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Abuja, Nigeria
28 Sep 199248.7SucceededBishop of Abuja, Nigeria
26 Mar 199450.2AppointedArchbishop of Abuja, Nigeria
24 Nov 201268.8Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 201268.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Saturnino
7 Apr 201369.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Saturnino
3 Jul 201369.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ahiara, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for John Olorunfemi Onaiyekan:
John Olorunfemi Cardinal Onaiyekan (born ) Archbishop of Abuja

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Abuja.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • card: Bollettino, 24 Oct 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2012
  • i: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 14 Jun 2014