Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alfons Maria Cardinal Stickler, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archivist Emeritus of the Vatican Secret Archives

Cardinal-Priest of San Giorgio in Velabro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1910BornNeunkirchen, Austria
27 Mar 193726.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
8 Sep 198373.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Volsinium
8 Sep 198373.0AppointedPro-Archivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
8 Sep 198373.0AppointedPro-Librarian of the Vatican Library
1 Nov 198373.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Volsinium
25 May 198574.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
25 May 198574.7Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 198574.7AppointedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
27 May 198574.7AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
May 198877.6RetiredArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
May 198877.6RetiredLibrarian of the Vatican Library
29 Jan 199685.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giorgio in Velabro
12 Dec 200797.3DiedArchivist Emeritus of the Vatican Secret Archives

MicroData Summary for Alfons Maria Stickler:
Alfons Maria Cardinal Stickler S.D.B. (born , died ) Archivist Emeritus of Vatican Secret Archives

  • a priest for 70.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
  • a cardinal for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Bollettino, 13 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015