Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Varkey Cardinal Vithayathil, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Major Archbishop of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabar)

Cardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1927BornParur
12 Jun 195427.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
11 Nov 199669.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabar), India
11 Nov 199669.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Achrida
6 Jan 199769.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Achrida
19 Apr 199769.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Antinoë
23 Dec 199972.5AppointedMajor Archbishop of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabar), India
21 Feb 200173.7Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200173.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
1 Apr 201183.8DiedMajor Archbishop of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Varkey Vithayathil:
Varkey Cardinal Vithayathil C.SS.R. (born , died ) Major Archbishop of Ernakulam-Angamaly

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
  • a cardinal for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,875
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 6 Aug 2015