Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Portella Mbuyu

Bishop of Kinkala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1942 BornPointe-Noire
31 Dec 196725.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Oct 200159.2AppointedBishop of Kinkala, Congo
6 Jan 200259.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kinkala, Congo

MicroData Summary for Louis Portella Mbuyu:
Bishop Louis Portella Mbuyu (born ) Bishop of Kinkala

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kinkala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,099

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013