Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ladislau Biernaski, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of São José dos Pinhais, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1937Born
6 Jul 196325.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
19 Apr 197941.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
19 Apr 197941.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tetci
27 May 197941.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tetci
5 Jul 198042.6InstalledAuxiliary Bishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
6 Dec 200669.1AppointedBishop of São José dos Pinhais, Parana, Brazil
13 Feb 201274.3DiedBishop of São José dos Pinhais, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Ladislau Biernaski
Bishop Ladislau Biernaski C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of São José dos Pinhais

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlmirante Tamandaré

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Dec 2006
  • d: CB, 13 Feb 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast