Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop András Veres

Bishop of Győr (Raab)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1959 BornNyírbátor
8 Mar 198626.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Eger, Hungary
2 Aug 198626.6Ordained PriestPriest of Eger, Hungary
5 Nov 199939.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary
5 Nov 199939.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cissa
6 Jan 200040.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cissa
20 Jun 200646.5AppointedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
19 Jan 201151.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Pécs, Hungary
25 Apr 201151.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Pécs, Hungary
17 May 201656.4AppointedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
16 Jul 201656.6InstalledBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

MicroData Summary for András Veres
Bishop András Veres (born ) Bishop of Győr (Raab)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Győr (Raab).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Jun 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,667
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 May 2016