Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Adam Stefan Cardinal Sapieha

Deceased

Archbishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1867Born
15 Jul 189326.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lviv, Ukraine
1 Oct 189326.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv, Ukraine
27 Nov 191144.5AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
17 Dec 191144.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kraków, Poland
14 Dec 192558.5AppointedArchbishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
18 Feb 194678.7Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 194678.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova
23 Jul 195184.1DiedArchbishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Adam Stefan Sapieha (VIAF: 40189672)
Adam Stefan Cardinal Sapieha (born , died ) Archbishop of Kraków {Cracow}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastle, Krasiczyn, Diocese of Przemyśl
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceArchbishop's Palace, Kraków, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
Buried Place (Original)Wawel, Cathedral, Kraków, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
  • a cardinal for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 101
  • od/c0: CB, 23 Dec 2017
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Feb 1946

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018