Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Zając

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kraków {Cracow}

Titular Bishop of Taddua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1939 BornLibiąż
23 Jun 196324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
14 Aug 200465.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
14 Aug 200465.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Taddua
15 Sep 200465.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Taddua
7 Oct 201475.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Zając:
Bishop Jan Zając (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kraków {Cracow}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,684
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 984
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 7 Oct 2014