Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Thomas Larkin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Petersburg, Florida, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1923Born
15 May 194724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
18 Apr 197956.0AppointedBishop of Saint Petersburg, Florida, USA
27 May 197956.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Petersburg, Florida, USA
28 Jun 197956.2InstalledBishop of Saint Petersburg, Florida, USA
29 Nov 198865.6RetiredBishop of Saint Petersburg, Florida, USA
4 Nov 200683.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint Petersburg, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for William Thomas Larkin
Bishop William Thomas Larkin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Petersburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMount Morris, NY
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceClearwater, FL
Buried Place (Original)Family plot, St. Patrick's, Cemetery, Mount Morris, NY

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • i/loc: CB, 15 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 13 Oct 2019

Quantcast