Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Józef Michalik

Archbishop Emeritus of Przemyśl


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1941 BornZambrów
23 May 196423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Łomża, Poland
1 Oct 198645.4AppointedBishop of Gorzów, Poland
16 Oct 198645.4Ordained BishopBishop of Gorzów, Poland
30 Nov 198645.6InstalledBishop of Gorzów, Poland
17 Apr 199351.9AppointedArchbishop of Przemyśl, Poland
30 Apr 201675.0RetiredArchbishop of Przemyśl, Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Michalik
Archbishop Józef Michalik (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Przemyśl

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Przemyśl.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Aug 2016