Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignace Baguibassa Sambar-Talkena

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kara, Togo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1935Born
30 Jun 196328.2Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 199661.6AppointedBishop of Kara, Togo
6 Jan 199761.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kara, Togo
7 Jan 200973.7ResignedBishop of Kara, Togo
3 Feb 201377.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Kara, Togo

MicroData Summary for Ignace Baguibassa Sambar-Talkena
Bishop Ignace Baguibassa Sambar-Talkena (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaga

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,877
  • d: CB, 5 Feb 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast