Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Clement XIII

Carlo della Torre Rezzonico

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1693Born
23 Dec 173138.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 173744.7Elevated to Cardinal
27 Jan 173844.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
11 Mar 174350.0AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
19 Mar 174350.0Ordained BishopBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
15 May 174754.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
17 Feb 175561.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
6 Jul 175865.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
16 Jul 175865.3InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
2 Feb 176975.9DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Carlo della Torre Rezzonico (VIAF: 27106709)
Pope Carlo della Torre Rezzonico (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopXII Apôtres, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
  • a cardinal for 20.5 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1737
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,743, Number 12
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 2, Ascendance
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 4, Number 141
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 470, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast