Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henryk Józef Nowacki

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Sweden

Titular Archbishop of Blera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1946 Born
31 May 197023.8Ordained PriestPriest of Tarnów, Poland
8 Feb 200154.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Blera
8 Feb 200154.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Slovakia
19 Mar 200154.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Blera
28 Nov 200761.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nicaragua
28 Jun 201265.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sweden
28 Jun 201265.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Iceland
6 Oct 201266.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Denmark
6 Oct 201266.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Finland
6 Oct 201266.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Norway
20 Feb 201770.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Sweden
20 Feb 201770.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Iceland
20 Feb 201770.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Denmark
20 Feb 201770.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Finland
20 Feb 201770.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Norway

MicroData Summary for Henryk Józef Nowacki (VIAF: 311411086)
Archbishop Henryk Józef Nowacki (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Sweden

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGunzenhausen, Germany

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Sweden.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,935
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Oct 2012
  • r: CB, 23 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Apr 2017