Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Belloli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Anagni-Alatri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1923Born
15 Jun 194622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
7 Dec 198764.3AppointedBishop of Anagni-Alatri, Italy
6 Jan 198864.4Ordained BishopBishop of Anagni-Alatri, Italy
6 Mar 199975.6RetiredBishop of Anagni-Alatri, Italy
5 Nov 201188.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Anagni-Alatri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Belloli (VIAF: 1758316)
Bishop Luigi Belloli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Anagni-Alatri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceInveruno, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceInveruno, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Anagni, Diocese of Anagni-Alatri

  • a priest for 65.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,429
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • c1/loc: AM, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast