Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Mendes

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago

Titular Bishop of Elephantaris in Proconsulari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1926BornSiparia
1 Nov 195326.9Ordained PriestPriest of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
25 Oct 198861.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
25 Oct 198861.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Elephantaris in Proconsulari
6 Jan 198962.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elephantaris in Proconsulari
16 Jan 200275.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
24 Jun 200578.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles

MicroData Summary for John Mendes:
Bishop John Mendes (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Port of Spain

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,025
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013