Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Chiarissimo Cardinal Falconieri Mellini

Deceased

Archbishop of Ravenna

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1794BornRoma
19 Sep 181823.9Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 182631.7AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
15 Aug 182631.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
12 Feb 183843.3Elevated to Cardinal
15 Feb 183843.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
22 Aug 185964.9DiedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Chiarissimo Falconieri Mellini (VIAF: 44290961)
Chiarissimo Cardinal Falconieri Mellini (born , died ) Archbishop of Ravenna

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
  • a cardinal for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 318
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 28
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Feb 1838

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Oct 2016