Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Justin Tetmu Samba

Deceased

Bishop of Musoma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1950BornMkuu-Rombo
21 Jun 197423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Musoma, Tanzania
25 Oct 198837.8AppointedBishop of Musoma, Tanzania
6 Jan 198938.0Ordained BishopBishop of Musoma, Tanzania
23 Aug 200655.6DiedBishop of Musoma, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Justin Tetmu Samba:
Bishop Justin Tetmu Samba (born , died ) Bishop of Musoma

  • a priest for 32.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,024
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015