Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ricardo García García

Prelate of Yauyos, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1955 Born
12 Jun 198328.2Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
12 Oct 200449.5AppointedPrelate of Yauyos, Peru
4 Dec 200449.7Ordained BishopPrelate of Yauyos, Peru

MicroData Summary for Ricardo García García
Bishop Ricardo García García (born ) Prelate of Yauyos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Yauyos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,719

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast