Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Attilio Nostro

Bishop-Elect of Mileto-Nicotera-Tropea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1966 Born
2 May 199326.7Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
19 Aug 202155.0AppointedBishop of Mileto-Nicotera-Tropea, Italy
25 Sep 202155.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mileto-Nicotera-Tropea, Italy
2 Oct 202155.1InstalledBishop of Mileto-Nicotera-Tropea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Attilio Nostro
Father Attilio Nostro (born ) Bishop-Elect of Mileto-Nicotera-Tropea

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalmi, Diocese of Mileto
Ordained PriestSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni in Laterano, Cathedral Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Mileto-Nicotera-Tropea.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Aug 2021
  • ob/i: CB, 19 Aug 2021
  • c1: AM, 24 Aug 2021
  • c2+: CB, 18 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Sep 2021

Quantcast