Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Raymond Leo Cardinal Burke

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1948 BornRichland Center
29 Jun 197527.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
10 Dec 199446.4AppointedBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
6 Jan 199546.5Ordained BishopBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
22 Feb 199546.6InstalledBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
2 Dec 200355.4AppointedArchbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
26 Jan 200455.6InstalledArchbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
27 Jun 200860.0AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
20 Nov 201062.4Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 201062.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
5 Feb 201162.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
28 Feb 201364.7CeasedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
16 Mar 201364.7ConfirmedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura

MicroData Summary for Raymond Leo Burke:
Raymond Leo Cardinal Burke (born ) Prefect of Apostolic Signatura

Please contact the Cardinal through the Apostolic Signatura.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,460
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Mar 2014