Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Voto

Deceased

Bishop of Castellaneta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1927BornOriolo Calabro
13 Jul 195225.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 198053.7AppointedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
6 Jan 198153.7Ordained BishopBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
21 Dec 198255.7DiedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Voto:
Bishop Francesco Voto (born , died ) Bishop of Castellaneta

  • a priest for 30.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015