Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Lema Garcia

Auxiliary Bishop of São Paulo

Titular Bishop of Alava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1956 BornSão Paulo
2 Jun 198528.9Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
30 Apr 201457.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
30 Apr 201457.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Alava
29 Jun 201458.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alava

MicroData Summary for Carlos Lema Garcia:
Bishop Carlos Lema Garcia (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of São Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of São Paulo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2014
  • ob: CB, 30 Apr 2014
  • c2: CB, 15 May 2014
  • c3+: CB, 4 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Jun 2014