Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mathew Moolakkatt, O.S.B.

Archbishop of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar)

Priest of Order of Saint Benedict


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1953 BornUzhavoor
27 Dec 197825.8Ordained PriestPriest of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar), India
6 Nov 199845.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar), India
6 Nov 199845.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Hólar
5 Dec 199845.7ProfessedPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
6 Jan 199945.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hólar
29 Aug 200350.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar), India
9 May 200552.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar), India
12 Dec 200552.7SucceededArchbishop of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Mathew Moolakkatt
Archbishop Mathew Moolakkatt O.S.B. (born ) Archbishop of Kottayam

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • s: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,460
  • prof: CB, 12 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Sep 2016