Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Kazimierz Cardinal Nycz

Archbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

Ordinary of Poland, Faithful of Eastern Rites


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1950 BornStara Wies
8 May 197222.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
20 May 197323.3Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
14 May 198838.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
14 May 198838.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Villa Regis
4 Jun 198838.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Villa Regis
9 Jun 200454.4AppointedBishop of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg, Poland
3 Mar 200757.1AppointedArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
1 Apr 200757.2InstalledArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
9 Jun 200757.4AppointedOrdinary of Poland, Faithful of Eastern Rites
20 Nov 201060.8Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 201060.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
29 Apr 201161.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

MicroData Summary for Kazimierz Nycz:
Kazimierz Cardinal Nycz (born ) Archbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Mar 2007
  • i: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2007
  • i: Bollettino, 19 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,122

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Apr 2014