Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Mojwok Nyiker

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Malakal, South Sudan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1933Born
21 Jul 196330.4Ordained PriestPriest of Malakal, Sudan
15 Mar 197946.1AppointedBishop of Malakal, South Sudan
27 May 197946.3Ordained BishopBishop of Malakal, South Sudan
16 May 200976.3RetiredBishop of Malakal, South Sudan
5 Jan 201884.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Malakal, South Sudan

MicroData Summary for Vincent Mojwok Nyiker
Bishop Vincent Mojwok Nyiker (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Malakal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAtigo-Tonga
Death PlaceKhartoum, Archdiocese of Khartoum, Sudan

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 38.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 May 2009
  • d: CB, 5 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast