Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Travaglino

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Monaco

Titular Archbishop of Litterae

Apostolic Nuncio to Other

Titular See: (F.A.O., I.F.A.D., P.A.M.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1939 BornBrusciano, Italy
15 Aug 196222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Nola, Italy
4 Apr 199252.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Litterae
4 Apr 199252.5AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Gambia
4 Apr 199252.5AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Guinea
4 Apr 199252.5AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Liberia
26 Apr 199252.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Litterae
2 May 199555.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nicaragua
30 Oct 200162.1AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
5 Jan 201171.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Other
8 Sep 201273.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Monaco
16 Jan 2016³76.3RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Monaco

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Travaglino:
Archbishop Luigi Travaglino (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Monaco

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Monaco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,672
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 17 Jan 2016