Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luis Del Palacio y Pérez-Medel

Bishop of Callao


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1950 BornMadrid, Spain
3 Feb 198534.9Ordained PriestPriest of Madrid, Spain
12 Dec 201161.7AppointedBishop of Callao, Peru
7 Jan 201261.8Ordained BishopBishop of Callao, Peru
22 Jan 201261.8InstalledBishop of Callao, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Luis Del Palacio y Pérez-Medel:
Bishop José Luis Del Palacio y Pérez-Medel (born ) Bishop of Callao

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Callao.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 27 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,198

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013