Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francisco Javier Cardinal Errázuriz Ossa, P. Schönstatt

Archbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace

Member of the Council of Cardinals


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1933 BornSantiago
16 Jul 196127.9Ordained PriestPriest
1974²40.3AppointedSuperior General of Institute of Schönstatt Fathers
22 Dec 199057.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life
22 Dec 199057.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hólar
6 Jan 199157.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hólar
24 Sep 199663.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Valparaíso, Chile
24 Apr 199864.6AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
17 May 199864.7InstalledArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
21 Feb 200167.5Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200167.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
15 Dec 201077.3RetiredArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
13 Apr 201379.6AppointedMember of the Council of Cardinals

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Errázuriz Ossa:
Francisco Javier Cardinal Errázuriz Ossa P. Schönstatt (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Chile

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,299
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 25 Jul 2014